NJ S2766 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Civil Service Commission establish mentoring program for certain civil service law enforcement applicants.
Title
Requires Civil Service Commission establish mentoring program for certain civil service law enforcement applicants.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4517 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4517 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.235. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4517 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4517 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2766 (2R)