NJ S2768 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A992
Note: Carry Foward to future S1029
Note: Carry Foward to future S1029
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State Chief Diversity Officer to conduct disparity study concerning utilization of minority-owned and women-owned businesses in State procurement process.
Title
Authorizes State Chief Diversity Officer to conduct disparity study concerning utilization of minority-owned and women-owned businesses in State procurement process.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4664 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4664 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-1-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4664 (1R) |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2768 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2768 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4664 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2768 (1R)
S2768 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4664 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2768 (1R)