NJ S2770 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A989
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes position of Minority Depository Institution Coordinator in EDA.
Title
Establishes position of Minority Depository Institution Coordinator in EDA.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-4) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2770 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4516 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4516 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee