NJ S2773 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies definition of health care service firms and homemaker-home health aides.
Title
Clarifies definition of health care service firms and homemaker-home health aides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4043 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.48. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A4043 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4043 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2773