NJ S2784 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits county clerk or register of deeds and mortgages to issue identification card to Gold Star Family Member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits county clerk or register of deeds and mortgages to issue identification card to Gold Star Family Member.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-05-30SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4833 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback