NJ S2784 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Senate Amendment (33-0) (Cryan)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Senate Amendment (33-0) (Cryan)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Dedicates personal protective equipment to long-term care facilities, home health agencies, hospice care providers, health care service firms, PACE programs, and certain community-based providers during public health emergency.
Title
Dedicates personal protective equipment to long-term care facilities, home health agencies, hospice care providers, health care service firms, PACE programs, and certain community-based providers during public health emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Cryan) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (36-0) (Cryan) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4485 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading