NJ S2785 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires long-term care facilities, as condition of licensure, to implement policies to prevent social isolation of residents.
Title
Requires long-term care facilities, as condition of licensure, to implement policies to prevent social isolation of residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4007 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.113. |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4007 (ACS) |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4007 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2785 (SCS)