NJ S2793 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1808
Note: Carry Foward to future A3944
Note: Carry Foward to future A3944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires campus diversity actions at public institutions of higher education and directs Secretary of Higher Education and Division on Civil Rights to develop guidance regarding diversity in faculty search and selection process.
Title
Requires campus diversity actions at public institutions of higher education and directs Secretary of Higher Education and Division on Civil Rights to develop guidance regarding diversity in faculty search and selection process.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2793 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S2793 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A5232 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S2793 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A5232 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)