NJ S2804 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires young children entering public schools or Head Start Programs for first time to have comprehensive eye examination completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires young children entering public schools or Head Start Programs for first time to have comprehensive eye examination completed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4310 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-1)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A4310 (1R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-14AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4310 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2804 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback