NJ S2807 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns service of food or refreshments on mortuary premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns service of food or refreshments on mortuary premises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2019-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (27-6)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4323 (Same As) 2018-07-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback