NJ S2811 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S772
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.339.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.339.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school report card to include information concerning number of mental health professionals and school safety specialists employed by each school district.
Title
Requires school report card to include information concerning number of mental health professionals and school safety specialists employed by each school district.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4838 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4838 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.339. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4838 (1R) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2811 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.339.
A4838 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2811 (2R)
A4838 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2811 (2R)