NJ S2826 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1479
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.414.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.414.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to offer cats and dogs no longer used for educational, research, or scientific purposes for adoption; designated the "Homes for Animal Heroes Act." *
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to offer cats and dogs no longer used for educational, research, or scientific purposes for adoption; designated the "Homes for Animal Heroes Act." *
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3274 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.414. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3274 (1R) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment (36-0) (Bucco) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3274 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2826 (2R)
S1479 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1479 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee