NJ S2842 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.124.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.124.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits raffles to be conducted remotely at large sporting venues.
Title
Permits raffles to be conducted remotely at large sporting venues.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Rep. Joseph Egan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4625 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4625 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.124. |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (35-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4625 |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4625 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2842