NJ S2863 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for grant recipients of Transportation Trust Fund Authority local aid program.
Title
Revises requirements for grant recipients of Transportation Trust Fund Authority local aid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5380 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5380 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.135. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5380 (1R) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Lampitt) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Sarlo) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5380 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2863 (4R)