NJ S2868 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1965
Note: Carry Over of previous S3322
Note: Carry Over of previous S3322
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for advocate in criminal cases concerning welfare or care of animal.
Title
Provides for advocate in criminal cases concerning welfare or care of animal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2868 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4533 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4533 (Same As) 2020-08-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee