NJ S2878 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S860
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.*
Title
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4636 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-29-1) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4636 (1R) |
2015-12-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-15) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2878 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4636 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2878 (1R)
A4636 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2878 (1R)