NJ S2880 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides penalty for registration violations occurring under State's saltwater fishing registry program.
Title
Provides penalty for registration violations occurring under State's saltwater fishing registry program.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Rep. John Amodeo [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] |
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for A4063 (1R) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-06-16 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-02 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4063 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by S2880 (2R)