NJ S2880 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.242.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.242.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides up to $25 million in tax credits under Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Program for certain infrastructure at Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey.
Title
Provides up to $25 million in tax credits under Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Program for certain infrastructure at Rutgers, the State University of New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4704 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4704 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.242. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-3) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-15-3) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4704 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-3) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4704 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2280 (2R)