NJ S2891 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3099

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4134 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Secure Choice Savings Program Act"; establishes retirement savings program for certain workers; establishes standard contribution level of 3 percent.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Secure Choice Savings Program Act"; establishes retirement savings program for certain workers; establishes standard contribution level of 3 percent.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted by A4134 (2R)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-08-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3099 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4134 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.56.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback