NJ S2915 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A724

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits application for PERS accidental disability benefit for injury sustained after January 2003 while employed at State psychiatric institution or correctional facility immediately prior to PERS membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits application for PERS accidental disability benefit for injury sustained after January 2003 while employed at State psychiatric institution or correctional facility immediately prior to PERS membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-02-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A259 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A724 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback