NJ S2921 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects project list in P.L.2018, c.85, which appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects.
Title
Corrects project list in P.L.2018, c.85, which appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Rep. Robert Clifton [R] | Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4418 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.137. |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-1) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4418 |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4418 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2921