NJ S2922 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.243.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.243.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE on its website to link to Department of Treasury's website where list is maintained of all third party individuals and vendors employed or retained for work associated with State assessments.*
Title
Requires DOE on its website to link to Department of Treasury's website where list is maintained of all third party individuals and vendors employed or retained for work associated with State assessments.*
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4925 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.243. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4925 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4925 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2922 (1R)