NJ S2924 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.196.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.196.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates two-year "Restorative and Transformative Justice for Youths and Communities Pilot Program" in Juvenile Justice Commission; appropriates $4.2 million in FY 2022 and FY 2023.
Title
Creates two-year "Restorative and Transformative Justice for Youths and Communities Pilot Program" in Juvenile Justice Commission; appropriates $4.2 million in FY 2022 and FY 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4663 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4663 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.196. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-21-1) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4663 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-11) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4663 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2924 (1R)