NJ S2925 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1760
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Combined with S2797 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Combined with S2797 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits posting or publishing on Internet home address or telephone number of certain judges and prosecutors.
Title
Prohibits posting or publishing on Internet home address or telephone number of certain judges and prosecutors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | Senate | Combined with S2797 (SCS) |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1649 (Same As) 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.125.
A1760 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A1760 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee