NJ S2928 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-14 - Approved P.L.2011, c.143.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-14 - Approved P.L.2011, c.143.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Task Force on the Closure of State Developmental Centers."
Title
Establishes "Task Force on the Closure of State Developmental Centers."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-14 | Approved P.L.2011, c.143. | |
2011-12-05 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-4) | |
2011-11-10 | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. | |
2011-09-26 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2011-08-25 | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (39-0) | |
2011-08-25 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-2) | |
2011-06-29 | Emergency Resolution (Albano) (75-0-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (32-6) | |
2011-06-27 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-27 | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-06 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |