NJ S2934 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1362
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4377 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4377 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT and OIT to develop materials concerning capabilities of airports in NJ and establishes "Public Use Airports Task Force."
Title
Requires DOT and OIT to develop materials concerning capabilities of airports in NJ and establishes "Public Use Airports Task Force."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4377 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2934 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4377 (1R)
A4377 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.483.
A4377 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.483.