NJ S2935 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by A4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by A4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases annual assessment on net written premiums of HMOs to support charity care from three percent to five percent in FY 2021.
Title
Increases annual assessment on net written premiums of HMOs to support charity care from three percent to five percent in FY 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Substituted by A4722 |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4722 (Same As) 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.96.