NJ S2968 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5283
Note: Carry Over of previous S3668
Note: Carry Over of previous S3668
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes definition of veteran for civil service hiring preference.
Title
Changes definition of veteran for civil service hiring preference.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1025 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5283 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3668 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5283 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3668 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee