NJ S2972 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DMVA assist and mentor veterans through criminal justice system.
Title
Requires DMVA assist and mentor veterans through criminal justice system.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4465 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.246. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4465 |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4465 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2972