NJ S2975 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1906
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in Paterson authorizing non-disclosure of records of certain expungements.
Title
Establishes pilot program in Paterson authorizing non-disclosure of records of certain expungements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4548 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-32-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4548 |
2015-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-16) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2975 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4548 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2975
A4548 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2975