NJ S2991 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S2991/3117
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4803/4811 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4803/4811 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns approval process for personal protective equipment and State stockpiles of personal protective equipment.
Title
Concerns approval process for personal protective equipment and State stockpiles of personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A4803/4811 (ACS/1R) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4811 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Combined with A4803 (ACS)
A4803 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
S2991/3117 (Replaced by) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4803/4811 (ACS/1R)
A4803 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
S2991/3117 (Replaced by) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4803/4811 (ACS/1R)