NJ S3004 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.59.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes retroactive date for provisions of P.L.2018, c.165, which clarifies provisions of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act."
Title
Establishes retroactive date for provisions of P.L.2018, c.165, which clarifies provisions of "Predatory Towing Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4947 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4947 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.59. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-1-0) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for A4947 |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4947 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3004