NJ S3015 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2058
Note: Carry Foward to future A5208
Note: Carry Over of previous A2365
Note: Carry Foward to future A5208
Note: Carry Over of previous A2365
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates gallery space on State House grounds for display of certain art works.
Title
Creates gallery space on State House grounds for display of certain art works.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3015 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3015 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3471 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2365 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3015 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3471 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2365 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee