NJ S3037 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes assistance program to assist landlord of one- and two-family dwellings during COVID-19 pandemic; appropriates $50 million.
Title
Establishes assistance program to assist landlord of one- and two-family dwellings during COVID-19 pandemic; appropriates $50 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4924 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee