NJ S3042 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.143.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates subaccounts for SHBP and SEHBP health care services and prescription drug claims; requires procurement by State of third-party medical claims reviewer.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates subaccounts for SHBP and SEHBP health care services and prescription drug claims; requires procurement by State of third-party medical claims reviewer.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4619 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.143.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4619 (2R)
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-03-18AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2019-03-14SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Sarlo)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4619 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3042 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback