NJ S3055 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes AOC to assess, collect, and pay service charges and costs for electronic payment of fees and other obligations owed courts; prohibits defendants from using debit cards for bail and penalty payments for certain crimes.
Title
Authorizes AOC to assess, collect, and pay service charges and costs for electronic payment of fees and other obligations owed courts; prohibits defendants from using debit cards for bail and penalty payments for certain crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4517 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4517 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4517 |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4517 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S3055