NJ S3057 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4612 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A4612 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies State-specific exam requirement for land surveyor license.
Title
Codifies State-specific exam requirement for land surveyor license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4612 (1R) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Cryan) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4612 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.117.