NJ S3063 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4852 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns eligibility for extended unemployment benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns eligibility for extended unemployment benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-16SenateSubstituted by A4852 (2R)
2020-11-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-19SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4852 (Same As) 2020-12-04 - Approved P.L.2020, c.131.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback