NJ S3080 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriation of $11,300,000 from General Fund to DOE to increase per pupil funding for nonpublic security aid from $75 to $150.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriation of $11,300,000 from General Fund to DOE to increase per pupil funding for nonpublic security aid from $75 to $150.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A4597 |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4597 (Same As) 2019-01-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.168.