NJ S3096 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S654
Note: Carry Foward to future A1188
Note: Carry Foward to future A1188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4563 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4563 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of bots to deceive person about origin and content of communication for certain commercial or election purposes.
Title
Prohibits use of bots to deceive person about origin and content of communication for certain commercial or election purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4563 (2R) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3096 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4563 (2R)
S3096 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4563 (2R)
A4563 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.486.
S3096 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4563 (2R)
A4563 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.486.