NJ S3100 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.259.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.259.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of hemophilia and expands hemophilia treatment program.
Title
Revises definition of hemophilia and expands hemophilia treatment program.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5186 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.259. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A5186 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5186 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S3100 (1R)