NJ S3117 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Combined with S2991 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Combined with S2991 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that State establish and manage stockpile of personal protective equipment and encourage manufacturing of personal protective equipment in State.
Title
Requires that State establish and manage stockpile of personal protective equipment and encourage manufacturing of personal protective equipment in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Combined with S2991 (SCS) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4803 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
A4811 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Combined with A4803 (ACS)
A4811 (Same As) 2020-10-22 - Combined with A4803 (ACS)