NJ S3125 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved P.L.2019, c.62.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Repayment Assistance Program and Household Income Affordable Repayment Plan for borrowers of New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Repayment Assistance Program and Household Income Affordable Repayment Plan for borrowers of New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4475 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.62.
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-2-0)
2019-02-25AssemblySubstituted for A4475 (1R)
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-01-28SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4475 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S3125

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback