NJ S3129 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved P.L.2019, c.61.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved P.L.2019, c.61.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of DOLWD to create list of labor organizations that represent workers on public work projects.
Title
Requires Commissioner of DOLWD to create list of labor organizations that represent workers on public work projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4314 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.61. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4314 |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-1) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4314 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S3129