NJ S3132 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2371
Note: Carry Foward to future S1756
Note: Carry Foward to future S1756
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."
Title
"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted by A2891 (4R) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3132 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
S3132 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
A2891 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S3132 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
A2891 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence