NJ S3146 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes owning or possessing animal fighting or dog fighting paraphernalia as crime of third degree; establishes civil animal cruelty penalties therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes owning or possessing animal fighting or dog fighting paraphernalia as crime of third degree; establishes civil animal cruelty penalties therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4698 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4698
2019-06-06AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-05-30SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2019-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4698 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3146

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback