NJ S3158 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4814/4520 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4814/4520 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes transient accommodation taxes and fees only applicable if rented through marketplace or travel agency.*
Title
Makes transient accommodation taxes and fees only applicable if rented through marketplace or travel agency.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A4814/4520 (ACS/1R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4814 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.235.