NJ S3164 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.398.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.398.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates NJ Legislative Youth Council.
Title
Creates NJ Legislative Youth Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4987 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4987 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.398. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A4987 (1R) |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4987 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3164 (1R)