NJ S3191 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4427
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.140.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.140.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends voting rights of representatives of sending districts on receiving district board of education.
Title
Extends voting rights of representatives of sending districts on receiving district board of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] |
Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3370 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.140. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A3370 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3370 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S3191
A4427 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4427 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee