NJ S3205 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-15-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises expungement eligibility and procedures. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises expungement eligibility and procedures. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4498 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-15-6)
2019-06-10AssemblySubstituted for A4498 (2R)
2019-06-10AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (24-11)
2019-06-10SenateMotion To Table Sa (21-12) (Weinberg)
2019-06-10SenateMotion To Sa (Oroho)
2019-05-20SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-20SenateRecommitted to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18SenateRecommitted to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-11-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4498 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S3205 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback